OR HB2261 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 179, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 179, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits remote sales of inhalant delivery systems. Prohibits remote sales of inhalant delivery systems. Defines "inhalant delivery system." Substitutes "21 years of age" for "the legal minimum purchase age." Requires tobacco retailer to obtain local license if operating in jurisdiction with local license requirement.
Title
Relating to items for which a person must obtain a minimum age to purchase.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 179, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Thatcher. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 44; Nays, 4--Evans, Owens, Post, Reschke; Excused, 12--Alonso Leon, Bonham, Clem, Dexter, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Nearman, Ruiz, Smith G, Wallan, Zika. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |