OR HB2258 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Judicial Department to establish Family Dependency Treatment Court Pilot Program in certain counties to minimize or eliminate amount of time children require protective custody as result of parent's alleged substance abuse. Directs Office of Governor to conduct study of family treatment courts and to report results to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to human services on or before September 15, 2020.] Appropriates moneys to Judicial Department and Department of Human Services for purposes related to Family Dependency Treatment Court Pilot Program.
Title
Relating to family treatment courts; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |