OR HB2258 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 184, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 31, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 184, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 31, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expands types of entities that may receive funding for certain activities related to science, technology, engineering and mathematics education and to career and technical education. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to entities that can receive grant distributions from the Department of Education; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 184, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 31, 2017. |
2017-05-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 20; nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, DeBoer, Ferrioli, Hansell, Johnson, Winters; excused, 3--Burdick, Olsen, Steiner Hayward. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-02-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Boone, Witt. |
2017-02-16 | House | Second reading. |
2017-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-13 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Education. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |