OR HB2257 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to Water Resources Department for purposes of facilitating enrollment of lands in Harney Basin in federal Conservation Reserve Enhancement Program, funding hydrologist position and measuring ground water levels in Harney Basin. Appropriates moneys to Water Resources Department for purposes of facilitating enrollment of lands in Harney Basin in federal Conservation Reserve Enhancement Program, funding hydrologist position and measuring ground water levels in Harney Basin. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to voluntary reduction of ground water use; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Water with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |