OR HB2257 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Chapter 5, (2017 Laws): Effective date March 20, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Chapter 5, (2017 Laws): Effective date March 20, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Department of Education to waive, under limited circumstances, fee for publisher or supplier who submits textbook title or item of instructional material for review by State Board of Education. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to fees for instructional materials; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Chapter 5, (2017 Laws): Effective date March 20, 2017. |
2017-03-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-03-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-02-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Vial. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-02-09 | House | Second reading. |
2017-02-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Education. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |