OR HB2253 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 41, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 15, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 41, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 15, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that Department of Corrections inmate may perform electrical or plumbing work if supervised by licensed electrician or plumber who is employee of Oregon Corrections Enterprises. Provides that public agency employee or agent exercising custodial supervision over inmates participating in program pursuant to agreement with Department of Corrections may be Oregon Corrections Enterprises employee. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the supervision of Department of Corrections inmates performing certain work; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | House | Chapter 41, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 15, 2017. |
2017-05-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Carried over to 05-03 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-02-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Olson, Speaker Kotek. |
2017-02-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 16, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-02-13 | House | Second reading. |
2017-02-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-08 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |