OR HB2251 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Water Resources Department to provide staff support to work through complex water basin issues and help implement agency priorities in priority water basins. Appropriates moneys, out of General Fund, to Water Resources Department for purposes of planning water use on regional and local bases, developing system for identifying local and regional water use needs and prioritizing among local and regional water use needs and implementing local and regional water use strategies and plans.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.] Directs Water Resources Department to provide staff support to work through complex water basin issues and help implement agency priorities in priority water basins. Directs office of Governor to work with Regional Solutions Program to convene and support bi-state task force to develop mitigation commitments related to implementation of certain agreements. Directs chair of Water Resources Commission and two designees of Speaker of House of Representatives to co-convene Regional Water Planning and Management Task Force to develop framework for state-supported water planning and management. Directs department to award grants to federally recognized Indian tribes and county governments for purposes related to community water forums. Requires Association of Oregon Counties to provide related staff support. Appropriates moneys to Governor and agencies for purposes related to Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to regional water management; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-13 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-03-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Water with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |