OR HB2249 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 150, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 150, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Department of Corrections to enter into agreements or arrangements with counties to provide supplemental funding for reentry support and services for offenders released before attaining 25 years of age.
Title
Relating to Department of Corrections provision of supplemental funding to counties for reentry support for certain offenders released before attaining 25 years of age.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 150, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Boone, Clem; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Heard. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Holvey, Lininger. |
2017-03-16 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-13 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |