OR HB2247 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 452, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 452, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes county to adopt ordinance or resolution authorizing waiver of interest charged for failure to pay taxes when due. Authorizes county to adopt ordinance or resolution authorizing county assessor to waive penalties and] waiver of interest charged for failure to file property tax return or] pay taxes when due. Applies only to 2020-2021 and 2021-2022] property tax years] year, to interest on taxes imposed on real property used in taxpayer's business, provided no uncontested delinquent property taxes were outstanding on such property as of February 15, 2020, and to delinquencies substantially due to effects of COVID-19 pandemic or 2020 Oregon fire season. Sets forth criteria for determining that delinquency is substantially due to effects of COVID-19 pandemic or 2020 Oregon fire season. Requires county that adopts ordinance or resolution to submit report to Legislative Revenue Officer that includes findings and statement of financial impact of waiver of interest on county. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the waiver of property tax charges; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 452, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Johnson, Kennemer. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-05-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Boshart Davis. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Evans; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2021-05-25 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2021-04-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2021-04-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Wildfire Recovery with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |