OR HB2246 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits Director of Department of State Lands from requiring enhancement of wetlands to correct violation of removal-fill law. Prohibits Director of Department of State Lands from requiring enhancement of wetlands to correct violation of removal-fill law.
Title
Relating to violations of removal-fill laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2246 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2246/Introduced |