OR HB2246 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Chapter 615, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Chapter 615, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expands entities that are eligible to receive apportionments under Ballot Measure 98 (2016) to include Oregon School for the Deaf, Youth Corrections Education Program and Juvenile Detention Education Program. Prescribes method for calculating apportionments for school and programs. Allows school districts to determine purposes for which school districts will use apportionments, based on total amount of apportionments that school districts receive. Allows school districts to use percentage of apportionments on purposes described in ballot measure for students in eighth grade. Prescribes additional eligibility requirements to receive apportionments and describes components of biennial plans. Refines definitions to align with other statutes. Makes other technical changes. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the High School Graduation and College and Career Readiness Act; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Education, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Education, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-10 | House | Chapter 615, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2017. |
2017-08-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-07-05 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-07-05 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-07-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-30 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-06-26 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2017-04-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-17 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Education by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-03-06 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Education, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-03-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |