OR HB2243 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 158, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 158, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "public library" as public agency providing to all residents of local government unit free and equal access to library and information services that are suitable for persons of all ages. Defines "public library" as public agency providing to all residents of local government unit free and equal access to library and information services for all residents of local government unit] that are suitable for persons of all ages. Requires State Library Board to establish minimum conditions for public libraries that include financial support from public funds, and] regularly scheduled open hours and that take into account library's service population] reasonable exemptions to libraries with service populations of 2,000 or fewer residents of local government unit.
Title
Relating to public libraries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 158, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 52; Nays, 3--Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 5--Findley, Greenlick, Hayden, Keny-Guyer, Wallan. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Nearman, Reschke; Excused, 1--Barreto; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-04-15 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Economic Development. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |