OR HB2242 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Public Utility Commission to consider differential energy burden and other inequities of affordability in rates. Authorizes public utilities to enter agreements to provide financial assistance for organizations to represent in regulatory proceedings before commission interests of low-income residential customers and residential customers that are members of environmental justice communities. Establishes Office of the Low-Income and Environmental Justice Advocate within commission. Authorizes office to intervene in certain proceedings. Requires Low-Income and Environmental Justice Advocate to convene advisory group to advise office in discharge of duties. Requires office to report on activities of office to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to energy no later than December 1, 2021. Directs commission to establish public process for investigating ways to address and mitigate, through nonbypassable means, differential energy burdens on classes of electric company] public utility customers and other inequities of affordability and environmental justice. Requires commission to report findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to energy and business no later than September 15, 2020] incorporate findings into commission's 2020 report to Environmental Justice Task Force and Governor. Sunsets public process January 2, 2021.
Title
Relating to public utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-02-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-31 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |