OR HB2237 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Office of Emergency Management to create and maintain roster of individuals available for temporary emergency-related work. Directs Office of Emergency Management to create and maintain roster of individuals available for temporary emergency-related work. Requires students at post-secondary institution of education who receive certain amount of grants or scholarships to fulfill requirements related to emergency preparedness. Prohibits Higher Education Coordinating Commission from awarding grants or scholarships to students who do not fulfill requirements.
Title
Relating to emergency preparedness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management with subsequent referral to Education. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2237 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2237/Introduced |