OR HB2236 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Rural Fire Protection District Community Development to study and develop recommendations for developing, enhancing or expanding ability of rural fire protection districts to facilitate community development efforts following natural disaster. Establishes Task Force on Rural Fire Protection District Community Development to study and develop recommendations for developing, enhancing or expanding ability of rural fire protection districts to facilitate community development efforts following natural disaster. Requires task force to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Sunsets task force December 31, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to community development; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2236 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2236/Introduced |