OR HB2236 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 59, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 59, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows farm tractors to operate on state highways that have speed limit or posted speed of more than 35 miles per hour.
Title
Relating to the offense of unlawfully operating a low-speed vehicle on a highway.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Lewis [R] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] | Rep. Jeff Barker [D] | Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] |
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Bill Post [R] |
Rep. Werner Reschke [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 59, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Carried over to 04-25 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral. Referred to Transportation by order of the President. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lewis. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 3--Holvey, Power, Rayfield; Excused, 1--Keny-Guyer; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Smith G, Smith Warner. |
2019-04-02 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |