OR HB2228 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 705, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 705, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of State Police to establish voluntary program through which department retains fingerprint cards or creates facsimiles of fingerprints received from Federal Bureau of Investigation, or created during state criminal records check, for purpose of notifying agencies and districts that subscribe to program of receipt of fingerprints or other identifying information by department for reasons related to administration of criminal justice. Requires department to provide facsimiles of fingerprints created during state criminal records check to Federal Bureau of Investigation. Requires department to destroy fingerprint cards and facsimiles of fingerprints upon receiving information that individual is no longer participating in program and to inform Federal Bureau of Investigation that individual is no longer participating in program.
Title
Relating to retention of fingerprint information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Chapter 705, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016. |
2015-07-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 4--Ferrioli, Johnson, Riley, Shields; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed.Ayes, 50; Nays, 9--Frederick, Hayden, Huffman, Reardon, Smith Warner, Stark, Weidner, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 1--Smith. |
2015-06-18 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-09 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-09 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-05-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-05-14 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |