OR HB2225 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires state agency to report to Director of Oregon Department of Administrative Services when any budgeted position is vacant for six months. Prohibits filling of vacant position if director determines, after state agency has opportunity to submit specific and valid reasons for retaining position, that insufficient reasons exist for retaining position. Instructs director to report each quarter on actions taken to President of Senate, Speaker of House of Representatives, members of Legislative Assembly and Legislative Fiscal Officer.
Title
Relating to vacant positions in state agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2225 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2225/Introduced |