OR HB2224 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits amount public body may charge for public employee time for responding to public records request. Limits amount public body may charge for public employee time for responding to public records request. Prohibits district attorney from reviewing petitions from persons seeking public records of county or other public body, if county or other public body provides financial support to district attorney or office of district attorney. Directs, in cases where district attorney is prohibited from reviewing petitions seeking disclosures of public record, Attorney General to issue opinion regarding subject of petition. Authorizes persons seeking disclosure of public records to request binding arbitration in lieu of instituting proceedings for injunctive or declaratory relief in court. Directs Public Records Advocate to appoint arbitrator. Requires advocate to develop and maintain list of interested and qualified persons to conduct arbitrations. Authorizes advocate to adopt rules establishing arbitrator qualifications and arbitration procedural requirements. Provides that limits on fees, restrictions on certain district attorney reviews of petitions, and option to choose binding arbitration become operative January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to public records; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2224 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2224/Introduced |