OR HB2222 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that Oregon State Hospital may not procure psychiatric treatment for patients at hospital by number of physicians employed by or contracting with Oregon Health and Science University that is in excess of 25 percent of total number of physicians who provide psychiatric treatment at hospital. Requires superintendent of Oregon State Hospital to establish and implement program for hiring relief positions consisting of health care personnel who provide specified services.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Oregon State Hospital; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Val Hoyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-23 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |