OR HB2220 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 58, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 6, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 58, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 6, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes dentists to prescribe and administer vaccines. Authorizes trained and certified] dentists to prescribe and administer vaccines. Directs Oregon Board of Dentistry to approve training course on prescription and administration of vaccines. Directs board to adopt rules related to prescription and administration of vaccines by dentists. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to vaccines administered by dentists; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 58, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 6, 2019. |
2019-05-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Carried over to 04-25 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hayden, Schouten. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Findley, Keny-Guyer. |
2019-03-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 28, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-26 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |