OR HB2219 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Instructs State Fish and Wildlife Commission to establish by rule certain requirements for sea urchin commercial fishery to address proliferation of purple sea urchins. Instructs State Fish and Wildlife Commission to establish by rule certain requirements for sea urchin commercial fishery to address proliferation of purple sea urchins.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to sea urchins.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-01-19HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-11HouseReferred to Agriculture, Land Use, Natural Resources, and Water.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback