OR HB2218 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that information concerning sex offenders convicted of certain offenses be released on website maintained by Department of State Police.
Title
Relating to sex offender information.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] | Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Rep. Gregory Barreto [R] | Rep. Margaret Doherty [D] |
Rep. Susan McLain [D] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Kathleen Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-02-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2218 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2218/Introduced |