OR HB2217 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits anyone other than patient from administering medication to end patient's life in humane and dignified manner. Defines "self-administer." to include ingestion or other delivery method.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to death with dignity; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 21--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 2--Prusak, Stark. |
2019-04-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 22, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-17 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |