OR HB2206 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 730, (2013 Laws): Effective date October 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 730, (2013 Laws): Effective date October 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes county to request declaration by Governor of emergency in county that is conducting elections at less than minimally adequate level.
Title
Relating to county services; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-14 | House | Chapter 730, (2013 Laws): Effective date October 7, 2013. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Thatcher; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Ferrioli. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hanna, Hoyle. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 5--Barton, Gomberg, Sprenger, Thatcher, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Bailey. |
2013-06-13 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-06-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |