OR HB2205 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 703, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 703, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Fund to End Commercial Sexual Exploitation of Children. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to Department of Justice to provide financial assistance to fund services, interventions and treatment for children who have been or may become victims of commercial sexual exploitation. Authorizes appointment of advisory committee to advise department and to make recommendations to department for awards of financial assistance.
Title
Relating to child victims of commercial sexual exploitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Chapter 703, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016. |
2015-07-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Shields. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Clem, Weidner. |
2015-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-18 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-05-28 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2015-05-26 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2015-02-13 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |