OR HB2202 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-01 - Chapter 706, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-01 - Chapter 706, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
States policy regarding balancing natural resource uses on certain high-value farmland in Willamette Valley.
Title
Relating to mining on land zoned for exclusive farm use; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-01 | House | Chapter 706, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 1, 2013. |
2013-08-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 24; nays, 6--Boquist, Close, George, Kruse, Olsen, Whitsett. |
2013-07-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 5--Hanna, Hicks, Holvey, Thompson, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2013-07-06 | House | Second reading. |
2013-07-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-07-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-07-03 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-07-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-07-03 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2013-06-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-06-20 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2013-04-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-02-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Land Use. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |