OR HB2201 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires local correctional facility to provide to veteran who is in pretrial detention health care recommended by United States Department of Veterans Affairs Veterans Health Administration. Requires local correctional facility to provide to veteran who is in pretrial detention health care recommended by United States Department of Veterans Affairs Veterans Health Administration. Requires Oregon Health Authority to enroll in medical assistance veteran who is in pretrial detention after 60 days in detention. Veteran's eligibility for medical assistance ceases when veteran is released or transferred to Department of Corrections facility. Upon veteran's release or transfer, at veteran's request, requires facility to transfer records of health care received at facility to administration or department.
Title
Relating to incarcerated veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2201 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2201/Introduced |