OR HB2189 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 143, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 143, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes statute of repose for actions arising out of real estate appraisal activity. Provides that action must be commenced before earlier of otherwise applicable period of limitation or six years after act or omission giving rise to action, except in actions based on fraud or misrepresentation.
Title
Relating to actions arising out of real estate appraisal activity.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 143, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Boone, Clem; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Heard. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 4--Nearman, Post, Reschke, Stark; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-03-15 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |