OR HB2188 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits employee of contracting agency that conducts cost analysis or determines feasibility of procurement, or exclusive representative of employee's bargaining unit, to seek judicial review of cost analysis or determination. Specifies conditions under which review may occur. Requires contracting agency to take certain steps to obtain information necessary to conduct cost analysis before advertising or soliciting procurement. Requires contracting agency under certain circumstances to update cost analysis and to reconsider determination of feasibility of agency performing services that are subject to procurement. Requires contracting agency to consider contractor's profit in cost analysis. Prohibits contracting agency from considering proceeds from selling or costs of replacing long-term assets in cost analysis. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day after adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to analyses required before conducting a procurement for services; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2188 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2188/Introduced |