OR HB2185 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Chapter 526, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Chapter 526, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes new requirements on pharmacy benefit managers registered in this state.
Title
Relating to pharmacy benefit managers.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | House | Chapter 526, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-07-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-19 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Hernandez. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 29. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill. (Printed C-Eng.) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng.(Printed B-Eng. ) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Prusak. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Barreto, Greenlick. |
2019-04-15 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |