OR HB2184 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies definitions applicable for purposes of universal service surcharge. Subjects sale of retail commercial mobile radio services and retail interconnected voice over internet protocol services to universal service surcharge. Reduces rate cap to six percent of sale of services subject to surcharge. Directs Public Utility Commission to transfer up to $5 million per year of moneys deposited in universal service fund to Broadband Fund. Establishes Broadband Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in Broadband Fund to Oregon Business Development Department to provide grants and loans under] through, and to administer, program for assisting qualified entities with projects for development of broadband service infrastructure. Directs department to adopt program for providing grants and loans by rule. Directs department to report annually to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to telecommunications on status of Broadband Fund. Sunsets Broadband Fund, transfer of moneys from universal service fund to Broadband Fund and grant program January 2, 2030. Becomes operative January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the universal service fund; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2019-06-30SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-29SenateRecommendation: Do pass the C-Eng. bill.
2019-06-29SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-29SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-06-24HouseThird reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 22--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 1--Clem.
2019-06-20HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed.
2019-06-14HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-12HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-12HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-05HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2019-05-20HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-05-20HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed B-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-05-14HouseWork Session held.
2019-04-25HouseWork Session held.
2019-04-02HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Revenue by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-03-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass as amended and be printed A-Engrossed, be referred to Revenue, and then referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-03-11HouseWork Session held.
2019-02-18HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-11HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2184
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2184/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2184/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2184/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2184/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2184/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2184/House%20Amendments%20to%20B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2184/C-Engrossed
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28144
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29440
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29994
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=476999

Bill Comments

feedback