OR HB2181 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Maritime Sector Workforce Development. Directs task force to, consistent with work of predecessor task force, study and develop description of maritime sector and maritime sector workforce in Oregon and develop recommendations for State Workforce and Talent Development Board to incorporate consideration of maritime sector into statewide workforce development system plan. Requires task force to report to certain committees of Legislative Assembly and to State Workforce and Talent Development Board no later than September 15, 2020. Sunsets task force on December 31, 2020. Requires State Workforce and Talent Development Board to conduct study and analyze how to best implement recommendations developed by prior and current Task Force on Maritime Sector Workforce Development. Requires board to submit report to interim legislative committees detailing recommendations for implementing recommendations from first task force by September 15, 2020, and recommendations for implementing recommendations from second task force by September 15, 2022. Sunsets January 2, 2021] board requirements on December 31, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to maritime sector workforce development; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Economic Development. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |