OR HB2179 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies zero-emission and electric vehicle rebate programs to allow rebate for purchase or lease of electric farm tractor or repowering of farm tractor. Modifies zero-emission and electric vehicle rebate programs to allow rebate for purchase or lease of electric farm tractor or repowering of farm tractor. Applies to electric farm tractors purchased or leased and farm tractor repower costs incurred on or after January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to electric farm equipment; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2179 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2179/Introduced |