OR HB2179 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 148, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 25, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 148, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 25, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits onsite treatment of septage prior to application of biosolids on exclusive farm use land using treatment facilities that are portable, temporary and transportable by truck trailer during authorized period of time. Permits onsite treatment of septage prior to application of biosolids on exclusive farm use land using treatment facilities that are portable, temporary and transportable by truck trailer during authorized period of time. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to onsite treatment of certain wastes prior to application on exclusive farm use land; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 148, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 25, 2017. |
2017-05-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Boone, Greenlick, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Olson. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Baertschiger Jr. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed.Ayes, 56; Absent, 2--Greenlick, Keny-Guyer; Excused, 2--Boone, Gorsek. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-03 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-31 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-03-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |