OR HB2178 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires state agencies to include, as part of agency request budget, analysis of extent to which goods and services can be acquired from work programs operated by Department of Corrections or Oregon Corrections Enterprises. Requires state agencies to include, as part of agency request budget, analysis of extent to which goods and services can be acquired from work programs operated by Department of Corrections or Oregon Corrections Enterprises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to corrections work programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-04-17SenateReferred to Labor and Business.
2023-04-13SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2023-04-13HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Andersen, Neron.
2023-04-13HouseThird reading. Carried by Mannix. Passed. Ayes, 33; Nays, 16--Andersen, Bowman, Chaichi, Conrad, Dexter, Fahey, Gamba, Hartman, Holvey, Hudson, Nelson, Neron, Pham K, Reschke, Sosa, Valderrama; Absent, 1--Boice; Excused, 8--Bynum, Goodwin, Javadi, Nathanson, Nguyen D, Pham H, Wallan, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Morgan, Speaker Rayfield.
2023-04-12HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2023 Calendar.
2023-04-11HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2023 Calendar.
2023-04-10HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 11, 2023 Calendar.
2023-04-10HouseSecond reading.
2023-04-07HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-04-04HouseWork Session held.
2023-03-28HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-11HouseReferred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB2178
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2178/Introduced
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23605
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24070
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77302
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/65154
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77194
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268026
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267127
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268575
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268574
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268493
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269398
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269156
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269396
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78096
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35199
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=573109

Bill Comments

feedback