OR HB2177 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Chief Justice of Supreme Court to collect fees from certain public bodies for use of certain state court technology services. Authorizes Chief Justice of Supreme Court to collect fees from certain public bodies for use of certain state court technology services. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state court technology fees; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-31 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-03-31 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Civil Law. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2177 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2177/Introduced |