OR HB2177 | 2017 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]


Directs Legislative Fiscal Office to conduct study and report findings regarding 2017-2019 biennium sources of Oregon Liquor Control Commission revenue related to alcoholic beverages and recipients of revenue distributions. Requires office to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2019. Sunsets January 2, 2020. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to Oregon Liquor Control Commission revenue related to alcoholic beverages; declaring an emergency.



2017-07-07HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2017-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

Bill Comments