OR HB2176 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Oregon Health Authority to study and evaluate need for and feasibility of expanding, reconstructing, renovating or otherwise improving space, bed capacity and facilities of state hospitals or of other state facilities that are or could be used for care and treatment of persons with mental illness, with aim of increasing patient capacity by 200 percent at each location. Directs Oregon Health Authority to study and evaluate need for and feasibility of expanding, reconstructing, renovating or otherwise improving space, bed capacity and facilities of state hospitals or of other state facilities that are or could be used for care and treatment of persons with mental illness, with aim of increasing patient capacity by 200 percent at each location. Directs authority to determine how many employees are necessary to provide adequate care and treatment to current patient populations at state hospitals and how many employees would be needed to provide adequate care and treatment for expanded patient population. Directs authority to evaluate feasibility of establishing reserve of qualified mental health professionals to augment existing staff at state hospitals, with focus on feasibility of employing retired mental health professionals or mental health professionals from outside this state. Requires reports to Legislative Assembly. Sunsets on January 1, 2025. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to expanding capacities at state hospitals; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-01-11HouseReferred to Behavioral Health and Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback