OR HB2171 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-14 - Work Session held.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Oregon Volunteers Commission for Voluntary Action and Service to maintain volunteer staff of court appointed special advocates sufficient to meet statutory requirement to appoint court appointed special advocate in every juvenile dependency proceeding. Requires commission to meet National CASA Association standards for number of court appointed special advocates and cases that are supervised at any one time by supervisors in CASA Volunteer Programs. Appropriates moneys to commission for purpose of maintaining volunteer staff and supervisory levels. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to supervision of court appointed special advocates; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-14HouseWork Session held.
2017-03-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2017-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback