OR HB2169 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Racial Justice Council to study potential changes to criminal justice system and to provide results of study to Legislative Assembly no later than December 31, 2021. Directs Racial Justice Council to study potential changes to criminal justice system and to provide results of study to Legislative Assembly no later than December 31, 2021. Sunsets January 2, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to criminal justice; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback