OR HB2168 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 201, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 201, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Juneteenth as legal state holiday. Establishes Juneteenth as legal state holiday. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to Juneteenth; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 201, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Clem, Smith Warner. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Frederick. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Heard, Thatcher. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Taken from 05-27 Calendar and placed on 06-01 Calendar on voice vote. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-08 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner, Meek. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 7--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Clem, Leif, Smith G, Speaker Kotek, Wallan. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-24 | House | Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |