OR HB2165 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 95, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires electric companies that make sales of electricity to 25,000 or more retail electricity consumers in this state to collect amount from all retail electricity consumers, to be expended to support transportation electrification pursuant to plan accepted by Public Utility Commission. Requires electric companies that make sales of electricity to 25,000 or more retail electricity consumers in this state to collect amount from all retail electricity consumers, to be expended to support transportation electrification pursuant to plan accepted by Public Utility Commission. Sunsets January 2, 2031. Authorizes commission to allow electric companies to recover costs from retail electricity consumers for prudent infrastructure measures to support transportation electrification if certain criteria are met. Increases, by $10,000, maximum base manufacturer's suggested retail price for hydrogen fuel-powered light-duty zero-emission vehicles to qualify for standard and Charge Ahead zero-emission and electric vehicle rebates. Modifies eligibility for and increases value of Charge Ahead zero-emission and electric vehicle rebates. Modifies provisions related to administrative costs of program. Repeals sunset on standard and Charge Ahead zero-emission and electric vehicle rebate programs. Maintains funding of programs through tax for privilege of engaging in business of selling motor vehicles at retail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to alternative fuel transportation.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed B-Eng) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Transportation, then to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-25HouseChapter 95, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
2021-05-26HouseGovernor signed.
2021-05-19SenatePresident signed.
2021-05-19HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-05-17SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-05-17SenateThird reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 10--Anderson, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Gelser, Thatcher.
2021-05-14SenateSecond reading.
2021-05-14SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2021-05-07SenateReferred to Transportation.
2021-05-06SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-05-06HouseThird reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 22--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 3--Alonso Leon, Nearman, Salinas.
2021-05-05HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-03HouseSubsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
2021-05-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed B-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
2021-04-29HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-10HouseReferred to Transportation by prior reference and then Ways and Means .
2021-03-10HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Transportation by prior reference, then be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-03-03HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Transportation, then Ways and Means.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2165
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2165/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2165/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2165/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2165/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2165/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2165/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31282
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32161
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=519780
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=522830

Bill Comments

feedback