OR HB2165 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Chapter 54, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Chapter 54, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to written plans for forest operations.
Title
Relating to written plans for forest operations.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Chapter 54, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012. | |
2011-05-16 | Governor signed. | |
2011-05-10 | President signed. | |
2011-05-06 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-02 | Boquist declared potential conflict of interest. | |
2011-05-02 | Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-04-28 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-28 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-04-26 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. | |
2011-03-16 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-03-15 | Third reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2011-03-14 | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 15, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-03-10 | Second reading. | |
2011-03-09 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-03-04 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-28 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. | |
2011-01-10 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |