OR HB2164 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Renames "Health Care for All Oregon Children" program to "Cover All People" program. Directs office of the Governor to study laws related to health and provide results to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022.] Sunsets January 2, 2023.] Renames "Health Care for All Oregon Children" program to "Cover All People" program. Expands eligibility for children from up to 19 years of age to age 26 or younger and includes parents of children enrolled in program who would qualify for medical assistance but for immigration status. Requires Oregon Health Authority in collaboration with Department of Consumer and Business Services to seek federal approval necessary to maximize federal financial participation in costs of program. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to health; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |