OR HB2156 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Chapter 611, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Chapter 611, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Revenue to establish program by means of which representatives of C corporations and S corporations may resolve issues and ask questions concerning Oregon corporate income and excise tax laws or application of Oregon corporation income and excise tax laws. Requires Department of Revenue to establish program by means of which representatives of C corporations and S corporations may resolve issues and ask questions concerning Oregon corporate income and excise tax laws or application of Oregon corporation income and excise tax laws. Requires department to dedicate trained employees, telephone number and electronic means of communication to permit department to answer questions or resolve issues in expedited manner. Requires that telephone number and electronic means of communication be separate from other telephone numbers or means of communication department uses for general tax questions or questions from tax practitioners. Requires department to list dedicated telephone number and means of electronic communication on notice or letter that department sends to business customer.
Title
Relating to a method of communication for businesses to contact the Department of Revenue regarding Oregon tax laws.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-07-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-10 | House | Chapter 611, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-08-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by DeBoer. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-06-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed.Ayes, 54; Absent, 1--Witt; Excused, 4--Barreto, Bentz, Boone, Williamson; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-29 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-06-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-27 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-27 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-26 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |