OR HB2152 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 201, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 201, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits small business development centers to use grant funds for outreach and marketing. Directs statewide network of small business development centers to collaborate with state agencies, state-supported organizations and private sector entities, whenever practicable, to accomplish certain objectives to improve the operation and usefulness of small business development centers for small businesses.
Title
Relating to small business development centers.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 201, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 1--Linthicum; excused, 3--Boquist, Olsen, Steiner Hayward. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-02-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Nearman; Excused, 2--Alonso Leon, Boone. |
2017-02-20 | House | Second reading. |
2017-02-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-02-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Trade. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |