OR HB2151 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset of homestead property tax deferral program for seniors and persons with disabilities. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the homestead property tax deferral program; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-03-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-03-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |