OR HB2147 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Chapter 402, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs governing body of each county to designate person to ensure interment of unclaimed cremated remains of veteran or survivor of veteran. Directs governing body of each county to designate person to ensure interment of unclaimed human] cremated remains of veteran or survivor of veteran. Limits civil liability for interment of eligible decedent except for gross negligence. Requires certain funerary entities] funeral establishments in possession of unclaimed human] cremated remains of veteran or survivor of veteran, under certain circumstances, to release human] unclaimed cremated remains and associated veteran status information upon request to] by veterans' remains coordinator , notify county veterans' service officer] and apply for state or federal benefits on behalf of decedent. Limits civil liability of funeral establishment for release of veteran status information or release of eligible decedent except for gross negligence. Authorizes certain funerary entities] funeral establishments in possession of unclaimed human remains of veteran or survivor of veteran to cremate, reduce or inter unclaimed human remains under certain circumstances. Directs county veterans' service officer] veterans' remains coordinator to report information about veteran or survivor of veteran to United States Department of Veterans Affairs. Requires county veterans' service officer] veterans' remains coordinator to establish and maintain list of reported information and to make information available upon request to veterans' remains coordinator] county veterans' service officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to veterans.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-04HouseChapter 402, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
2023-07-27HouseGovernor signed.
2023-06-22SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-22HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-21SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Knopp.
2023-06-21SenateThird reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 25; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher.
2023-06-20SenateCarried over to 06-21 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-16SenateCarried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-15SenateCarried over to 06-16 by unanimous consent.
2023-05-02SenateSecond reading.
2023-05-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2023-04-25SenateWork Session held.
2023-04-20SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-03-31SenateReferred to Veterans, Emergency Management, Federal and World Affairs.
2023-03-28SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2023-03-27HouseThird reading. Carried by Goodwin. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 5--Dexter, Evans, Javadi, Nguyen D, Nguyen H; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Boshart Davis.
2023-03-23HouseSecond reading.
2023-03-22HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2023-03-16HouseWork Session held.
2023-01-19HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-12HouseReferred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB2147
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2147/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2147/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2147/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2147/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23079
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75777
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76423
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/73437
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75844
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/73446
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76002
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264498
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/258496
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265217
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265370
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265195
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271064
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271205
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271370
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78797
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34619
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=567456
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35412
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=588177

Bill Comments

feedback