OR HB2140 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 13, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 13, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies laws relating to program for home and farm loans to veterans. Modifies laws relating to program for home and farm loans to veterans.
Title
Relating to veterans' loans.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 13, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-05-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Boquist, Frederick, Heard. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral. Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness by order of the President. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-03-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Wright. Passed. Ayes, 56; Absent, 1--Alonso Leon; Excused, 3--Clem, Hernandez, Wallan. |
2021-03-08 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-16 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2021-01-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |